+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (6)
On April 11, 2013 in the House:
- Committee transferred to House Finance
On March 27, 2013 in the House:
- Committee postponed at request of sponsor (04/03/2013)
- Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration
On March 18, 2013 in the House:
- Committee postponed at request of sponsor (03/19/2013)
On March 15, 2013 in the House:
- Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration
On February 27, 2013 in the House:
- Introduced, referred to House Corporations