+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (11)
On July 9, 2015 in the House:
- Signed by Governor
On July 7, 2015 in the House:
- Transmitted to Governor
On June 24, 2015 in the Senate:
- Senate passed Sub A in concurrence
- Placed on Senate Calendar (06/24/2015)
On June 23, 2015 in the House:
- House passed Sub A
- Placed on House Calendar (06/23/2015)
- Committee recommends passage of Sub A
On June 19, 2015 in the House:
- Scheduled for consideration (06/23/2015)
On April 29, 2015 in the House:
- Committee recommended measure be held for further study
On April 10, 2015 in the House:
- Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (04/29/2015)
On February 25, 2015 in the House:
- Introduced, referred to House H.E.W.