+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (10)
On June 10, 2015 in the Senate:
- Committee recommended measure be held for further study
On June 8, 2015 in the Senate:
- Scheduled for hearing (06/10/2015)
On June 4, 2015 in the Senate:
- Referred to Senate Education
On June 2, 2015 in the House:
- House passed Sub A
On May 29, 2015 in the House:
- Placed on House Calendar (06/02/2015)
On May 27, 2015 in the House:
- Committee recommends passage of Sub A
On May 22, 2015 in the House:
- Scheduled for consideration (05/27/2015)
On March 25, 2015 in the House:
- Committee recommended measure be held for further study
On March 20, 2015 in the House:
- Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (03/25/2015)
On February 25, 2015 in the House:
- Introduced, referred to House H.E.W.