+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (11)
On June 24, 2015 in the Senate:
- Committee recommends passage of Sub A in concurrence
On June 23, 2015 in the Senate:
- Scheduled for consideration (06/25/2015)
On June 22, 2015 in the Senate:
- Scheduled for consideration (06/24/2015)
On June 18, 2015 in the Senate:
- Referred to Senate Education
On June 17, 2015 in the House:
- House passed Sub A
On June 13, 2015 in the House:
- Placed on House Calendar (06/17/2015)
On June 11, 2015 in the House:
- Committee recommends passage of Sub A
On June 5, 2015 in the House:
- Scheduled for consideration (06/11/2015)
On March 25, 2015 in the House:
- Committee recommended measure be held for further study
On March 20, 2015 in the House:
- Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (03/25/2015)
On February 25, 2015 in the House:
- Introduced, referred to House H.E.W.