+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (14)
On July 5, 2017 in the House:
- Signed by Governor
On June 29, 2017 in the House:
- Transmitted to Governor
On June 27, 2017 in the Senate:
- Senate passed in concurrence
On June 22, 2017 in the Senate:
- Placed on the Senate Consent Calendar (06/27/2017)
- Committee recommends passage in concurrence
On June 16, 2017 in the Senate:
- Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (06/22/2017)
On June 14, 2017 in the Senate:
- Referred to Senate Health and Human Services
On June 14, 2017 in the House:
- House read and passed
On June 9, 2017 in the House:
- Placed on House Calendar (06/14/2017)
On June 7, 2017 in the House:
- Committee recommends passage
On June 2, 2017 in the House:
- Scheduled for consideration (06/07/2017)
On March 15, 2017 in the House:
- Committee recommended measure be held for further study
On March 10, 2017 in the House:
- Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (03/15/2017)
On February 16, 2017 in the House:
- Introduced, referred to House H.E.W.