+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (7)
On May 9, 2013 in the House:
- Committee recommended measure be held for further study
On April 29, 2013 in the House:
- Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (05/09/2013)
On April 26, 2013 in the House:
- Meeting postponed (05/02/2013)
On April 18, 2013 in the House:
- Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration
On April 4, 2013 in the House:
- Committee postponed at request of sponsor (04/10/2013)
- Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration
On February 14, 2013 in the House:
- Introduced, referred to House Judiciary