+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (14)
On July 11, 2013 in the House:
- Signed by Governor
On July 9, 2013 in the House:
- Transmitted to Governor
On July 2, 2013 in the Senate:
- Senate passed Sub A in concurrence
- Placed on the Senate Consent Calendar (07/02/2013)
On June 18, 2013 in the Senate:
- Committee recommends passage of Sub A in concurrence
On June 14, 2013 in the Senate:
- Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (06/18/2013)
On May 30, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred to Senate Judiciary
On May 29, 2013 in the House:
- House passed Sub A
On May 23, 2013 in the House:
- Placed on House Calendar (05/29/2013)
On May 21, 2013 in the House:
- Committee recommends passage of Sub A
On May 17, 2013 in the House:
- Scheduled for consideration (05/21/2013)
On May 7, 2013 in the House:
- Committee recommended measure be held for further study
On April 18, 2013 in the House:
- Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (05/07/2013)
On February 14, 2013 in the House:
- Introduced, referred to House Judiciary