+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (14)
On June 28, 2019 in the House:
- House passed Sub A
On June 28, 2019 in the Senate:
- Referred to Senate Judiciary
On June 27, 2019 in the House:
- Committee recommends passage of Sub A
- Placed on House Calendar (06/28/2019)
On June 26, 2019 in the House:
- Scheduled for consideration (06/27/2019)
- Proposed Substitute
On May 14, 2019 in the House:
- Committee recommended measure be held for further study
On May 10, 2019 in the House:
- Scheduled for consideration (05/14/2019)
- Proposed Substitute
On March 6, 2019 in the House:
- Committee postponed at request of sponsor (03/06/2019)
On March 4, 2019 in the House:
- Scheduled for consideration
On February 27, 2019 in the House:
- Committee recommended measure be held for further study
On February 15, 2019 in the House:
- Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (02/27/2019)
On February 14, 2019 in the House:
- Introduced, referred to House Judiciary