+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (14)
On June 30, 2017 in the House:
- Signed by Governor
On June 28, 2017 in the House:
- Transmitted to Governor
On June 27, 2017 in the Senate:
- Senate passed Sub A in concurrence
On June 22, 2017 in the Senate:
- Placed on the Senate Consent Calendar (06/27/2017)
On June 14, 2017 in the Senate:
- Committee recommends passage of Sub A in concurrence
On June 9, 2017 in the Senate:
- Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (06/14/2017)
On June 1, 2017 in the Senate:
- Referred to Senate Housing and Municipal Government
On May 31, 2017 in the House:
- House passed Sub A
On May 26, 2017 in the House:
- Placed on House Calendar (05/31/2017)
On May 24, 2017 in the House:
- Committee recommends passage of Sub A
On May 19, 2017 in the House:
- Scheduled for consideration (05/24/2017)
On March 2, 2017 in the House:
- Committee recommended measure be held for further study
On February 24, 2017 in the House:
- Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (03/02/2017)
On February 15, 2017 in the House:
- Introduced, referred to House Municipal Government