+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (12)
On June 13, 2019 in the Senate:
- Senate passed Sub A in concurrence
On June 13, 2019 in the House:
- Transmitted to Governor
- Signed by Governor
On June 11, 2019 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Calendar (06/13/2019)
On June 6, 2019 in the House:
- House passed Sub A
On May 28, 2019 in the House:
- Committee recommends passage of Sub A
- Placed on House Calendar (06/06/2019)
On May 24, 2019 in the House:
- Scheduled for consideration (05/28/2019)
- Proposed Substitute
On March 6, 2019 in the House:
- Committee recommended measure be held for further study
On March 4, 2019 in the House:
- Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (03/06/2019)
On February 14, 2019 in the House:
- Introduced, referred to House Judiciary