+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (5)
On May 24, 2017 in the House:
- Committee recommended measure be held for further study
On May 19, 2017 in the House:
- Scheduled for consideration (05/24/2017)
On March 15, 2017 in the House:
- Committee recommended measure be held for further study
On March 10, 2017 in the House:
- Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (03/15/2017)
On February 15, 2017 in the House:
- Introduced, referred to House H.E.W.