+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (12)
On April 9, 2015 in the House:
- Effective without Governor's signature
On March 19, 2015 in the House:
- Transmitted to Governor
On March 19, 2015 in the Senate:
- Senate passed in concurrence
On March 17, 2015 in the Senate:
- Placed on the Senate Consent Calendar (03/19/2015)
On March 12, 2015 in the Senate:
- Committee recommends passage in concurrence
On March 10, 2015 in the Senate:
- Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (03/12/2015)
On March 5, 2015 in the Senate:
- Referred to Senate Judiciary
On February 26, 2015 in the House:
- House read and passed
On February 24, 2015 in the House:
- Placed on the House Consent Calendar (02/26/2015)
- Committee recommends passage
On February 18, 2015 in the House:
- Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (02/24/2015)
On February 12, 2015 in the House:
- Introduced, referred to House Judiciary
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor