+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (12)
On April 19, 2017 in the House:
- Effective without Governor's signature
On April 11, 2017 in the House:
- Transmitted to Governor
On April 11, 2017 in the Senate:
- Senate passed in concurrence
On April 6, 2017 in the Senate:
- Placed on the Senate Consent Calendar (04/11/2017)
On April 4, 2017 in the Senate:
- Committee recommends passage in concurrence
On March 30, 2017 in the Senate:
- Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (04/04/2017)
- Referred to Senate Judiciary
On March 2, 2017 in the House:
- House read and passed
On February 28, 2017 in the House:
- Placed on the House Consent Calendar (03/02/2017)
- Committee recommends passage
On February 24, 2017 in the House:
- Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (02/28/2017)
On February 8, 2017 in the House:
- Introduced, referred to House Judiciary
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor