+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (12)
On March 10, 2017 in the House:
- Effective without Governor's signature
On March 2, 2017 in the House:
- Transmitted to Governor
On March 2, 2017 in the Senate:
- Senate passed in concurrence
On March 1, 2017 in the Senate:
- Placed on the Senate Consent Calendar (03/02/2017)
On February 28, 2017 in the Senate:
- Committee recommends passage in concurrence
On February 23, 2017 in the Senate:
- Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (02/28/2017)
On February 15, 2017 in the Senate:
- Referred to Senate Judiciary
On February 14, 2017 in the House:
- House read and passed
On February 10, 2017 in the House:
- Placed on the House Consent Calendar (02/14/2017)
On February 7, 2017 in the House:
- Committee recommends passage
On February 3, 2017 in the House:
- Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (02/07/2017)
- Introduced, referred to House Judiciary
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor