+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (5)
On March 14, 2013 in the House:
- Committee recommended measure be held for further study
On March 11, 2013 in the House:
- Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (03/14/2013)
On March 6, 2013 in the House:
- Meeting postponed
On March 5, 2013 in the House:
- Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration
On February 12, 2013 in the House:
- Introduced, referred to House Environment and Natural Resources