+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (5)
On February 27, 2019 in the House:
- Committee recommended measure be held for further study
On February 15, 2019 in the House:
- Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (02/27/2019)
On February 12, 2019 in the House:
- Committee postponed at request of sponsor (02/13/2019)
On February 8, 2019 in the House:
- Introduced, referred to House Judiciary
- Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration