+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (18)
On September 27, 2017 in the House:
- Signed by Governor
On September 21, 2017 in the House:
- Transmitted to Governor
On June 29, 2017 in the House:
- House passed Sub B in concurrence
On June 28, 2017 in the House:
- Placed on House Calendar (06/29/2017)
On June 28, 2017 in the Senate:
- Senate passed Sub B
On June 21, 2017 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Calendar (06/28/2017)
- Committee recommends passage of Sub B
- Committee voted to reconsider
- Committee recommends passage of Sub A as amended in concurrence
On June 16, 2017 in the Senate:
- Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (06/21/2017)
On June 15, 2017 in the Senate:
- Referred to Senate Rules, Government Ethics and Oversight
On March 1, 2017 in the House:
- House passed Sub A as amended (floor amendment)
On February 24, 2017 in the House:
- Placed on House Calendar (03/01/2017)
On February 14, 2017 in the House:
- Committee recommends passage of Sub A
On February 10, 2017 in the House:
- Scheduled for consideration (02/14/2017)
On February 8, 2017 in the House:
- Committee recommended measure be held for further study
On February 3, 2017 in the House:
- Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (02/08/2017)
On February 2, 2017 in the House:
- Introduced, referred to House Judiciary