+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (11)
On July 18, 2017 in the House:
- Signed by Governor
On July 13, 2017 in the House:
- Transmitted to Governor
On June 28, 2017 in the Senate:
- Senate passed Sub A in concurrence
On June 27, 2017 in the Senate:
- Placed on the Senate Consent Calendar (06/28/2017)
On June 26, 2017 in the House:
- House passed Sub A
On June 24, 2017 in the House:
- Placed on House Calendar (06/26/2017)
On June 20, 2017 in the House:
- Committee recommends passage of Sub A
On June 16, 2017 in the House:
- Scheduled for consideration (06/20/2017)
On February 14, 2017 in the House:
- Committee recommended measure be held for further study
On February 10, 2017 in the House:
- Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (02/14/2017)
On February 1, 2017 in the House:
- Introduced, referred to House Judiciary