+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (5)
On March 10, 2015 in the House:
- Committee recommended measure be held for further study
On March 5, 2015 in the House:
- Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (03/10/2015)
On February 23, 2015 in the House:
- Committee postponed at request of sponsor (02/24/2015)
On February 19, 2015 in the House:
- Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration
On February 4, 2015 in the House:
- Introduced, referred to House Corporations