+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (11)
On July 16, 2013 in the House:
- Signed by Governor
On July 10, 2013 in the House:
- Transmitted to Governor
On July 1, 2013 in the Senate:
- Senate passed Sub A as amended in concurrence
- Placed on Senate Calendar (07/01/2013)
On June 26, 2013 in the House:
- House passed Sub A as amended (floor amendment)
On June 25, 2013 in the House:
- Placed on House Calendar (06/26/2013)
On June 24, 2013 in the House:
- Committee recommends passage of Sub A
On June 22, 2013 in the House:
- Scheduled for consideration (06/24/2013)
On May 1, 2013 in the House:
- Committee recommended measure be held for further study
On April 19, 2013 in the House:
- Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (05/01/2013)
On February 6, 2013 in the House:
- Introduced, referred to House Judiciary