+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (12)
On March 25, 2019 in the House:
- Signed by Governor
On March 19, 2019 in the Senate:
- Senate passed Sub A in concurrence
On March 19, 2019 in the House:
- Transmitted to Governor
On March 13, 2019 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Calendar (03/19/2019)
On March 12, 2019 in the House:
- House passed Sub A
On March 8, 2019 in the House:
- Placed on House Calendar (03/12/2019)
On March 5, 2019 in the House:
- Committee recommends passage of Sub A
On March 1, 2019 in the House:
- Scheduled for consideration (03/05/2019)
- Proposed Substitute
On February 7, 2019 in the House:
- Committee recommended measure be held for further study
On February 1, 2019 in the House:
- Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (02/07/2019)
On January 31, 2019 in the House:
- Introduced, referred to House Finance