+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (12)
On March 21, 2019 in the House:
- Effective without Governor's signature
On March 13, 2019 in the Senate:
- Senate passed in concurrence
On March 13, 2019 in the House:
- Transmitted to Governor
On March 12, 2019 in the Senate:
- Placed on the Senate Consent Calendar (03/13/2019)
On March 7, 2019 in the House:
- Committee recommends passage in concurrence
On March 1, 2019 in the House:
- Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (03/07/2019)
On February 28, 2019 in the Senate:
- Referred to Senate Judiciary
On February 26, 2019 in the House:
- House read and passed
On February 8, 2019 in the House:
- Placed on the House Consent Calendar (02/26/2019)
On February 5, 2019 in the House:
- Committee recommends passage
On February 1, 2019 in the House:
- Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (02/05/2019)
On January 30, 2019 in the House:
- Introduced, referred to House Judiciary
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor