+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (9)
On June 25, 2015 in the House:
- House passed Sub A
- Placed on House Calendar (06/25/2015)
- Committee recommends passage of Sub A
- Scheduled for consideration (06/25/2015)
On April 7, 2015 in the House:
- Committee recommended measure be held for further study
On April 2, 2015 in the House:
- Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (04/07/2015)
On February 20, 2015 in the House:
- Committee postponed at request of sponsor (02/24/2015)
On February 19, 2015 in the House:
- Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration
On January 29, 2015 in the House:
- Introduced, referred to House Corporations