+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (5)
On April 30, 2015 in the House:
- Committee recommended measure be held for further study
On April 10, 2015 in the House:
- Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (04/30/2015)
On February 12, 2015 in the House:
- Committee postponed at request of sponsor
On February 6, 2015 in the House:
- Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (02/12/2015)
On January 21, 2015 in the House:
- Introduced, referred to House Labor