+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (5)
On June 26, 2019 in the House:
- Meeting postponed (06/26/2019)
On June 24, 2019 in the House:
- Scheduled for consideration
On March 27, 2019 in the House:
- Committee recommended measure be held for further study
On March 22, 2019 in the House:
- Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (03/27/2019)
On January 24, 2019 in the House:
- Introduced, referred to House H.E.W.