+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (5)
On January 29, 2015 in the House:
- Committee recommended measure be held for further study
On January 26, 2015 in the House:
- Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (01/29/2015)
- Meeting postponed (01/27/2015)
On January 23, 2015 in the House:
- Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration
On January 21, 2015 in the House:
- Introduced, referred to House Corporations