+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (14)
On July 2, 2019 in the House:
- Effective without Governor's signature
On June 24, 2019 in the House:
- Transmitted to Governor
On June 18, 2019 in the Senate:
- Senate passed in concurrence
On June 11, 2019 in the House:
- Committee recommends passage in concurrence
On June 11, 2019 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Calendar (06/18/2019)
On June 7, 2019 in the House:
- Scheduled for consideration (06/11/2019)
On May 22, 2019 in the Senate:
- Referred to Senate Finance
On May 9, 2019 in the House:
- House read and passed
On May 7, 2019 in the House:
- Committee recommends passage
- Placed on House Calendar (05/09/2019)
On May 3, 2019 in the House:
- Scheduled for consideration (05/07/2019)
On May 2, 2019 in the House:
- Committee recommended measure be held for further study
On April 30, 2019 in the House:
- Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (05/02/2019)
On January 23, 2019 in the House:
- Introduced, referred to House Finance