+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (14)
On March 20, 2015 in the House:
- Effective without Governor's signature
On March 12, 2015 in the House:
- Transmitted to Governor
On March 12, 2015 in the Senate:
- Senate passed in concurrence
On March 10, 2015 in the Senate:
- Placed on the Senate Consent Calendar (03/12/2015)
On February 24, 2015 in the Senate:
- Committee recommends passage in concurrence
On February 18, 2015 in the Senate:
- Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (02/24/2015)
On February 12, 2015 in the Senate:
- Referred to Senate Judiciary
On February 10, 2015 in the House:
- House read and passed
On February 4, 2015 in the House:
- Placed on the House Consent Calendar (02/10/2015)
On February 3, 2015 in the House:
- Committee recommends passage
On January 30, 2015 in the House:
- Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (02/03/2015)
On January 26, 2015 in the House:
- Meeting postponed (01/27/2015)
On January 23, 2015 in the House:
- Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration
On January 21, 2015 in the House:
- Introduced, referred to House Judiciary
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor