+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (16)
On June 27, 2017 in the House:
- Signed by Governor
On June 21, 2017 in the House:
- Transmitted to Governor
On June 21, 2017 in the Senate:
- Senate passed in concurrence
On June 20, 2017 in the Senate:
- Placed on the Senate Consent Calendar (06/21/2017)
On June 8, 2017 in the Senate:
- Committee recommends passage in concurrence
On June 2, 2017 in the Senate:
- Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (06/08/2017)
On February 14, 2017 in the Senate:
- Committee recommended measure be held for further study
On February 10, 2017 in the Senate:
- Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (02/14/2017)
On February 2, 2017 in the Senate:
- Referred to Senate Judiciary
On January 31, 2017 in the House:
- House read and passed
On January 27, 2017 in the House:
- Placed on House Calendar (01/31/2017)
On January 24, 2017 in the House:
- Committee recommends passage
On January 20, 2017 in the House:
- Scheduled for consideration (01/24/2017)
On January 18, 2017 in the House:
- Committee recommended measure be held for further study
On January 13, 2017 in the House:
- Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (01/18/2017)
On January 12, 2017 in the House:
- Introduced, referred to House Judiciary