+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (5)
On March 22, 2017 in the House:
- Committee recommended measure be held for further study
On March 17, 2017 in the House:
- Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (03/22/2017)
On March 13, 2017 in the House:
- Meeting postponed (03/14/2017)
On March 10, 2017 in the House:
- Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration
On January 12, 2017 in the House:
- Introduced, referred to House Judiciary