+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (11)
On September 28, 2017 in the House:
- Signed by Governor
On September 25, 2017 in the House:
- Transmitted to Governor
On September 19, 2017 in the Senate:
- Senate passed Sub A in concurrence
- Placed on Senate Calendar (09/19/2017)
On September 19, 2017 in the House:
- House passed Sub A
On September 15, 2017 in the House:
- Placed on House Calendar (09/19/2017)
On June 30, 2017 in the House:
- Committee recommends passage of Sub A
- Scheduled for consideration (06/30/2017)
On January 31, 2017 in the House:
- Committee recommended measure be held for further study
On January 27, 2017 in the House:
- Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (01/31/2017)
On January 11, 2017 in the House:
- Introduced, referred to House Judiciary