+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (8)
On May 22, 2019 in the Senate:
- Referred to Senate Judiciary
On May 1, 2019 in the House:
- House read and passed
On April 26, 2019 in the House:
- Placed on House Calendar (05/01/2019)
On March 27, 2019 in the House:
- Committee recommends passage
On March 22, 2019 in the House:
- Scheduled for consideration (03/27/2019)
On February 27, 2019 in the House:
- Committee recommended measure be held for further study
On February 15, 2019 in the House:
- Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (02/27/2019)
On January 10, 2019 in the House:
- Introduced, referred to House H.E.W.