+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (5)
On March 30, 2017 in the House:
- Committee recommended measure be held for further study
On March 24, 2017 in the House:
- Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (03/30/2017)
On February 8, 2017 in the House:
- Meeting postponed (02/09/2017)
On February 2, 2017 in the House:
- Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration
On January 11, 2017 in the House:
- Introduced, referred to House Labor