+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (11)
On February 13, 2019 in the House:
- Effective without Governor's signature
On February 5, 2019 in the House:
- Recommended for Immediate Consideration
On February 5, 2019 in the Senate:
- Senate passed in concurrence
On February 5, 2019 in the House:
- Transmitted to Governor
On January 31, 2019 in the House:
- House read and passed
On January 29, 2019 in the House:
- Committee recommends passage
- Placed on House Calendar (01/31/2019)
On January 25, 2019 in the House:
- Scheduled for consideration (01/29/2019)
On January 23, 2019 in the House:
- Committee recommended measure be held for further study
On January 18, 2019 in the House:
- Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (01/23/2019)
On January 3, 2019 in the House:
- Introduced, referred to House Judiciary
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor