+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (12)
On February 14, 2013 in the House:
- Signed by Governor
On February 12, 2013 in the House:
- Transmitted to Governor
On February 12, 2013 in the Senate:
- Senate passed in concurrence
On February 7, 2013 in the Senate:
- Placed on the Senate Consent Calendar (02/12/2013)
On February 5, 2013 in the Senate:
- Committee recommends passage in concurrence
On February 1, 2013 in the Senate:
- Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (02/05/2013)
On January 30, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred to Senate Judiciary
On January 29, 2013 in the House:
- House read and passed
On January 23, 2013 in the House:
- Placed on the House Consent Calendar (01/29/2013)
On January 22, 2013 in the House:
- Committee recommends passage
On January 16, 2013 in the House:
- Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (01/22/2013)
On January 3, 2013 in the House:
- Introduced, referred to House Judiciary
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor