+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (44)
On May 15, 1998 in the House:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0861)
On April 29, 1998 in the House:
- Reenrolled bill text (HB961ER)
On April 22, 1998 in the House:
- Enacted, Chapter 861 (effective 7/1/98)
On April 22, 1998 in the Senate:
- Senate concurred in Gov's recommendation (39-Y 0-N)
On April 22, 1998 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar
On April 22, 1998 in the Senate:
- Signed by President as reenrolled
On April 22, 1998 in the House:
- House concurred in Gov's recom. (Block Vote) (100-Y 0-N)
On April 22, 1998 in the Senate:
- VOTE: (39-Y 0-N)
On April 22, 1998 in the House:
- Governor's recommendation adopted
- Reenrolled
- Signed by Speaker as reenrolled
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE-ADOPTION (100-Y 0-N)
On April 16, 1998 in the House:
- Governor's recommendation received by House
On March 31, 1998 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On March 30, 1998 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
- Enrolled
On March 24, 1998 in the House:
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB961ER)
On March 10, 1998 in the Senate:
- VOTE: PASSAGE R (39-Y 0-N)
- Read third time
- Passed Senate (39-Y 0-N)
- Rec. of Sen. passage agreed to by Senate (38-Y 0-N)
- Passed Senate (39-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: PASSAGE R (39-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: RECONSIDER R (38-Y 0-N)
On March 9, 1998 in the Senate:
- VOTE: (39-Y 0-N)
- Const. reading disp., passed by for the day (39-Y 0-N)
On March 8, 1998 in the Senate:
- Reported from Courts of Justice (14-Y 0-N)
On February 23, 1998 in the Senate:
- Assigned to C. J. sub-committee: Civil & Property Law
On February 17, 1998 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice
- Constitutional reading dispensed
On February 16, 1998 in the House:
- Engrossed by House - com. sub. 980880432-H1
- Read second time
- Committee substitute agreed to 980880432-H1
- Passed House (Block Vote) (100-Y 0-N)
- Constitutional reading dispensed (99-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: CONSTITUTIONAL READING (99-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (100-Y 0-N)
- Communicated to Senate
On February 15, 1998 in the House:
- Read first time
On February 14, 1998 in the House:
- Committee substitute printed 980880432-H1
- Reported from C. J. with substitute (24-Y 0-N)
On February 2, 1998 in the House:
- Assigned to C. J. sub-committee: 2
On January 26, 1998 in the House:
- Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice
- Presented & ordered printed 984515432
+ − Amendment
+ − Votes (10)
April 22, 1998: VOTE: (39-Y 0-N)
April 22, 1998: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE-ADOPTION (100-Y 0-N)
March 10, 1998: VOTE: PASSAGE R (39-Y 0-N)
March 10, 1998: VOTE: PASSAGE R (39-Y 0-N)
March 10, 1998: VOTE: RECONSIDER R (38-Y 0-N)
March 9, 1998: VOTE: (39-Y 0-N)
March 8, 1998: Reported from Courts of Justice (14-Y 0-N)
February 16, 1998: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (100-Y 0-N)
February 16, 1998: VOTE: CONSTITUTIONAL READING (99-Y 0-N)
February 14, 1998: Reported from C. J. with substitute (24-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor