+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (25)
On March 17, 1997 in the House:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0232)
On March 10, 1997 in the House:
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 232 (effective 7/1/97)
On March 5, 1997 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On March 4, 1997 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
On March 3, 1997 in the House:
- Enrolled
On February 24, 1997 in the House:
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB2155ER)
On February 17, 1997 in the Senate:
- VOTE: PASSAGE (40-Y 0-N)
- Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
- Read third time
On February 14, 1997 in the Senate:
- VOTE: CONST. READING DISPENSED (39-Y 0-N)
- Const. reading disp., passed by for the day (39-Y 0-N)
On February 13, 1997 in the Senate:
- Reported from Finance (17-Y 0-N)
On February 5, 1997 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Finance
- Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N)
On February 4, 1997 in the House:
- Communicated to Senate
- VOTE: PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N)
- Read third time and passed House (99-Y 0-N)
On February 3, 1997 in the House:
- Engrossed by House - com. sub. 970993288-H1
- Committee substitute agreed to 970993288-H1
- Read second time
On February 2, 1997 in the House:
- Read first time
On February 1, 1997 in the House:
- Committee substitute printed 970993288-H1
- Reported from Appropriations with sub. (20-Y 2-N)
On January 16, 1997 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Appropriations
- Presented & ordered printed 974808819
+ − Votes (5)
February 17, 1997: VOTE: PASSAGE (40-Y 0-N)
February 14, 1997: VOTE: CONST. READING DISPENSED (39-Y 0-N)
February 13, 1997: Reported from Finance (17-Y 0-N)
February 4, 1997: VOTE: PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N)
February 1, 1997: Reported from Appropriations with sub. (20-Y 2-N)
+ − Sponsors (22)
Type:
Primary Sponsor