+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (24)
On April 16, 1998 in the House:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0384)
On April 11, 1998 in the House:
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 384 (effective 7/1/98)
On March 26, 1998 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On March 25, 1998 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
On March 24, 1998 in the House:
- Enrolled
On March 16, 1998 in the House:
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB1204ER)
On March 2, 1998 in the Senate:
- VOTE: PASSAGE R (40-Y 0-N)
- Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
- Read third time
On February 27, 1998 in the Senate:
- Passed by for the day
On February 26, 1998 in the Senate:
- VOTE: CONST. RDG. DISPENSED R (39-Y 0-N)
- Const. reading disp., passed by for the day (39-Y 0-N)
On February 25, 1998 in the Senate:
- Reported from Courts of Justice (12-Y 1-N)
On February 11, 1998 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice
- Constitutional reading dispensed
On February 10, 1998 in the House:
- Communicated to Senate
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N)
- Read third time and passed House (Block Vote) (98-Y 0-N)
On February 9, 1998 in the House:
- Read second time and engrossed
On February 6, 1998 in the House:
- Read first time
On February 5, 1998 in the House:
- Reported from General Laws (26-Y 0-N)
On January 28, 1998 in the House:
- Assigned to General Laws sub-committee: 1
On January 26, 1998 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on General Laws
- Presented & ordered printed 981528492
+ − Votes (5)
March 2, 1998: VOTE: PASSAGE R (40-Y 0-N)
February 26, 1998: VOTE: CONST. RDG. DISPENSED R (39-Y 0-N)
February 25, 1998: Reported from Courts of Justice (12-Y 1-N)
February 10, 1998: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N)
February 5, 1998: Reported from General Laws (26-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsors (50)
Type:
Primary Sponsor