+ − Full Texts (6)
+ − Actions (5)
On December 18, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Substituted by S1811 (SCS/2R)
On December 11, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Reported out of Assembly Comm. with Amendments, 2nd Reading
On June 23, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Transferred to Assembly Budget Committee
On June 12, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Reported as an Assembly Committee Substitute and Referred to Assembly Appropriations Committee
On March 24, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Introduced, Referred to Assembly Labor Committee
+ − Votes (2)
December 11, 2014: r/Aca
- Yeas: 7
- Nays: 4
- Present/NV: 1
June 12, 2014: r/ACS
- Yeas: 6
+ − Sponsors (14)
Type:
Primary Sponsor