+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (5)
On June 20, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Substituted by S1253 (1R)
On June 6, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading
On May 6, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Reported as an Assembly Committee Substitute and Referred to Assembly Appropriations Committee
On April 20, 2012 in the Assembly:
- Reviewed by the Pension and Health Benefits Commission Recommend to not enact
On January 10, 2012 in the Assembly:
- Introduced, Referred to Assembly Health and Senior Services Committee
+ − Votes (2)
June 6, 2013: r/favorably
- Yeas: 6
May 6, 2013: r/ACS
- Yeas: 7
- Nays: 2
+ − Sponsors (13)
Type:
Primary Sponsor