+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (11)
On March 15, 2017 in the Senate:
- Signed Chap.16
On March 3, 2017 in the Senate:
- Delivered To Governor
On March 2, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Returned To Senate
- Passed Assembly
On March 1, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Ordered To Third Reading Rules Cal.27
- Substituted For A369
On January 18, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Referred To Tourism, Parks, Arts And Sports Development
On January 17, 2017 in the Senate:
- Delivered To Assembly
- Passed Senate
On January 9, 2017 in the Senate:
- Ordered To Third Reading Cal.8
On January 5, 2017 in the Senate:
- Referred To Rules
+ − Votes (2)
January 17, 2017: Floor Vote (Senate)
- Yeas: 60
- Present/NV: 3
January 9, 2017: Committee Vote (Senate Rules)
- Yeas: 24
- Nays: 1
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor