+ − Full Texts (9)
+ − Actions (6)
On January 13, 2020 in the Assembly:
- Substituted by S974 (1R)
On December 16, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Assembly Floor Amendment Passed (Sumter)
On June 20, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Assembly Floor Amendment Passed (Sumter)
On June 13, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading
On May 16, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Reported and Referred to Assembly Appropriations Committee
On February 8, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Introduced, Referred to Assembly Women and Children Committee
+ − Votes (2)
June 13, 2019: r/favorably
- Yeas: 11
May 16, 2019: r/Aca
- Yeas: 5