+ − Full Texts (7)
+ − Actions (9)
On January 13, 2020 in the Assembly:
- Passed Assembly (Passed Both Houses) (76-0-0)
- Substituted for A3040 (2R)
On January 9, 2020 in the Assembly:
- Received in the Assembly without Reference, 2nd Reading
On January 9, 2020 in the Senate:
- Passed by the Senate (38-0)
On December 16, 2019 in the Senate:
- Senate Amendment (36-0) (Singleton)
On December 5, 2019 in the Senate:
- Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading
On June 11, 2018 in the Senate:
- Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
- Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading
On January 16, 2018 in the Senate:
- Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee
+ − Votes (6)
January 13, 2020: 3RDG FINAL PASSAGE
- Yeas: 76
- Present/NV: 4
January 13, 2020: SUB FOR A3040
- Present/NV: 80
January 9, 2020: 3RDG FINAL PASSAGE
- Yeas: 38
- Present/NV: 2
December 16, 2019: 2ND READING
- Present/NV: 40
December 16, 2019: AMEND
- Yeas: 36
- Present/NV: 4
December 5, 2019: r/favorably
- Yeas: 13