+ − Full Texts (9)
+ − Actions (11)
On July 21, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Approved P.L.2017, c.161.
On June 22, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Passed Assembly (Passed Both Houses) (67-3-3)
- Received in the Assembly, 2nd Reading on Concurrence
On June 22, 2017 in the Senate:
- Passed by the Senate (38-0)
- Substituted for S1305 (2R)
- Senate Amendment (32-0) (Vitale)
- Received in the Senate without Reference, 2nd Reading
On June 22, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Passed by the Assembly (69-4-2)
On December 15, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading
On October 6, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Reported out of Asm. Comm. with Amendments, and Referred to Assembly Appropriations Committee
On February 16, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Introduced, Referred to Assembly Health and Senior Services Committee
+ − Votes (8)
June 22, 2017: SUBSTITUTE FOR S1305
- Present/NV: 40
June 22, 2017: CONCUR IN SA
- Yeas: 67
- Nays: 3
- Present/NV: 7
June 22, 2017: AMEND
- Yeas: 32
- Present/NV: 8
June 22, 2017: 3RDG FINAL PASSAGE
- Yeas: 69
- Nays: 4
- Present/NV: 5
June 22, 2017: 2ND READING
- Present/NV: 40
June 22, 2017: 3RDG FINAL PASSAGE
- Yeas: 38
- Present/NV: 2
December 15, 2016: r/favorably
- Yeas: 6
- Nays: 3
- Present/NV: 2
October 6, 2016: r/Aca
- Yeas: 10
- Present/NV: 2
+ − Sponsors (18)
Type:
Primary Sponsor