+ − Full Texts (9)
+ − Actions (11)
On July 21, 2017 in the Senate:
- Approved P.L.2017, c.150.
On June 22, 2017 in the Senate:
- Passed Senate (Passed Both Houses) (36-1)
- Substituted for S607 (1R)
On June 1, 2017 in the Senate:
- Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading
On March 13, 2017 in the Senate:
- Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
- Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading
On February 27, 2017 in the Senate:
- Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate Judiciary Committee
On February 15, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Passed by the Assembly (69-0-0)
On October 6, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading
On March 7, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Reported out of Asm. Comm. with Amendments, and Referred to Assembly Appropriations Committee
On January 27, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Introduced, Referred to Assembly Judiciary Committee
+ − Votes (6)
June 22, 2017: 3RDG FINAL PASSAGE
- Yeas: 36
- Nays: 1
- Present/NV: 3
June 22, 2017: SUBSTITUTE FOR S607
- Present/NV: 40
June 1, 2017: r/favorably
- Yeas: 13
February 15, 2017: 3RDG FINAL PASSAGE
- Yeas: 69
- Present/NV: 11
October 6, 2016: r/favorably
- Yeas: 10
- Present/NV: 1
March 7, 2016: r/Aca
- Yeas: 7
+ − Sponsors (30)
Type:
Primary Sponsor