+ − Full Texts (6)
+ − Actions (8)
On May 6, 2013 in the Senate:
- Approved P.L.2013, c.53.
On March 18, 2013 in the Senate:
- Passed Senate (Passed Both Houses) (38-0)
- Substituted for S2502
On February 4, 2013 in the Senate:
- Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading
- Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate Commerce Committee
On January 28, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Passed by the Assembly (75-0-0)
On January 14, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Reported out of Assembly Comm. with Amendments, 2nd Reading
On January 8, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Introduced, Referred to Assembly Financial Institutions and Insurance Committee
+ − Votes (5)
March 18, 2013: 3RDG FINAL PASSAGE
- Yeas: 38
- Present/NV: 2
March 18, 2013: SUBSTITUTE FOR S2502
- Present/NV: 40
February 4, 2013: r/favorably
- Yeas: 6
January 28, 2013: 3RDG FINAL PASSAGE
- Yeas: 75
- Present/NV: 5
January 14, 2013: r/Aca
- Yeas: 7
- Present/NV: 1
+ − Sponsors (22)
Type:
Primary Sponsor