+ − Full Texts (6)
+ − Actions (8)
On May 7, 2015 in the Senate:
- Approved P.L.2015, c.53.
On March 16, 2015 in the Senate:
- Passed Senate (Passed Both Houses) (39-0)
- Substituted for S2231 (1R)
On March 9, 2015 in the Senate:
- Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading
On December 1, 2014 in the Senate:
- Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee
On November 13, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Passed by the Assembly (72-1-0)
On October 2, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Reported out of Assembly Comm. with Amendments, 2nd Reading
On July 11, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Introduced, Referred to Assembly Health and Senior Services Committee
+ − Votes (5)
March 16, 2015: 3RDG FINAL PASSAGE
- Yeas: 39
- Present/NV: 1
March 16, 2015: SUBSTITUTE FOR S2231
- Present/NV: 40
March 9, 2015: r/favorably
- Yeas: 7
- Present/NV: 2
November 13, 2014: 3RDG FINAL PASSAGE
- Yeas: 72
- Nays: 1
- Present/NV: 7
October 2, 2014: r/Aca
- Yeas: 11
- Present/NV: 1
+ − Sponsors (9)
Type:
Primary Sponsor