+ − Full Texts (6)
+ − Actions (8)
On July 21, 2017 in the Senate:
- Approved P.L.2017, c.171.
On June 19, 2017 in the Senate:
- Passed Senate (Passed Both Houses) (38-0)
- Substituted for S2808 (1R)
On May 18, 2017 in the Senate:
- Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading
On May 1, 2017 in the Senate:
- Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate Education Committee
On March 23, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Passed by the Assembly (74-0-0)
On November 14, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Reported out of Assembly Comm. with Amendments, 2nd Reading
On September 19, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Introduced, Referred to Assembly Education Committee
+ − Votes (5)
June 19, 2017: 3RDG FINAL PASSAGE
- Yeas: 38
- Present/NV: 2
June 19, 2017: SUBSTITUTE FOR S2808
- Present/NV: 40
May 18, 2017: r/favorably
- Yeas: 4
- Present/NV: 1
March 23, 2017: 3RDG FINAL PASSAGE
- Yeas: 74
- Present/NV: 6
November 14, 2016: r/Aca
- Yeas: 9
- Present/NV: 2
+ − Sponsors (9)
Type:
Primary Sponsor