+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (10)
On June 16, 2016 in the Senate:
- Substituted By A3330
On May 11, 2016 in the Senate:
- Advanced To Third Reading
On May 10, 2016 in the Senate:
- 2nd Report Cal.
On May 9, 2016 in the Senate:
- 1st Report Cal.725
On January 6, 2016 in the Senate:
- Referred To Elections
On June 25, 2015 in the Senate:
- Committed To Rules
On April 29, 2015 in the Senate:
- Advanced To Third Reading
On April 28, 2015 in the Senate:
- 2nd Report Cal.
On April 27, 2015 in the Senate:
- 1st Report Cal.432
On January 12, 2015 in the Senate:
- Referred To Elections
+ − Votes (2)
May 9, 2016: Committee Vote (Senate Elections)
- Yeas: 8
- Present/NV: 1
April 27, 2015: Committee Vote (Senate Elections)
- Yeas: 8
- Present/NV: 1