+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (9)
On July 21, 2017 in the Senate:
- Approved P.L.2017, c.160.
On June 19, 2017 in the Senate:
- Passed Senate (Passed Both Houses) (38-0)
- Substituted for S3197
On May 18, 2017 in the Senate:
- Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading
On May 1, 2017 in the Senate:
- Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate Higher Education Committee
On March 23, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Passed by the Assembly (70-0-4)
On September 8, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading
- Transferred to Assembly Higher Education Committee
On February 16, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Introduced, Referred to Assembly Regulated Professions Committee
+ − Votes (5)
June 19, 2017: 3RDG FINAL PASSAGE
- Yeas: 38
- Present/NV: 2
June 19, 2017: SUBSTITUTE FOR S3197
- Present/NV: 40
May 18, 2017: r/favorably
- Yeas: 5
March 23, 2017: 3RDG FINAL PASSAGE
- Yeas: 70
- Present/NV: 6
September 8, 2016: r/favorably
- Yeas: 6
- Present/NV: 1
+ − Sponsors (16)
Type:
Primary Sponsor